CT HB07004 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require youth coaches of youth athletic activities conducted on fields, courts and recreational areas owned, operated or managed by municipalities to take an online concussion course.
Title
An Act Concerning Concussion Education For Coaches Of Youth Athletic Activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health |
2019-03-28 | House | File Number 187 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 137 |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |