CT HB07043 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-12-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - File Number 810
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To specify certain parameters for a room or other location in the workplace that accommodates employee breastfeeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Breastfeeding In The Workplace.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 35 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseFile Number 810
2019-04-25HouseSenate Calendar Number 406
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-23HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-23HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7131
2019-04-17HouseBill Passed Temporarily
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 412
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 264
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-20HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-15HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-03-14HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-19HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback