CT HB07044 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - File Number 860
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To clarify provisions regarding sexual harassment prevention training, permitted defenses regarding sexual harassment complaints, and calculation of damages and corrective action in sexual harassment complaint proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Sexual Harassment In The Workplace.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseFile Number 860
2019-05-01HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-01HouseNew File by Committee on Judiciary
2019-05-01HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-25HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-23HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-22HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-04-17HouseReferred by House to Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-03HouseFile Number 339
2019-04-03HouseHouse Calendar Number 217
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-03HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/05
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-02-25HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-07HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback