CT HB07055 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 413
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To create a competitive bidding process for a resort-casino facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Creating A Competitive Bidding Process For A Resort-casino Facility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 413
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 265
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
2019-03-15HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/26
2019-02-07HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback