CT HB07063 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To authorize the Adjutant General to lease military facilities to members of the armed forces of the state for ceremonies to recognize significant military career events.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Leasing Of Military Department Facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 337 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 235 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-17HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-17HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-13HousePublic Act 19-46
2019-06-04HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-04HouseSenate Passed
2019-05-31HouseSenate Calendar Number 659
2019-05-31HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-29HouseHouse Passed
2019-03-07HouseFile Number 26
2019-03-07HouseHouse Calendar Number 33
2019-03-07HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-07HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM
2019-02-20HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback