CT HB07064 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-9-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To change "veterans' service contact person" to "municipal veterans' representative" and to permit volunteers to serve as such representatives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Municipal Veterans' Representatives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 398 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 104 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24HousePublic Act 19-148
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-16HouseFile Number 905
2019-05-16HouseSenate Calendar Number 499
2019-05-16HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-14HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-14HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8590
2019-03-07HouseFile Number 27
2019-03-07HouseHouse Calendar Number 34
2019-03-07HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-07HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM
2019-02-20HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback