CT HB07071 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide financial relief for caregivers.
Title
An Act Providing An Income Tax Deduction For Individuals Caring For Elderly Persons, Children Or Disabled Persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-03-07 | House | File Number 28 |
2019-03-07 | House | House Calendar Number 35 |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-26 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-13 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |