CT HB07072 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase funding for meals on wheels in the Connecticut home-care program for the elderly by ten per cent from fiscal 2018 rates.
Title
An Act Increasing Funding For Elderly Nutrition Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-07 | House | File Number 29 |
2019-03-07 | House | House Calendar Number 36 |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-26 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-13 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |