CT HB07081 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow certain business entities to claim the manufacturing apprenticeship tax credit against the personal income tax.
Title
An Act Extending The Manufacturing Apprenticeship Tax Credit To Pass-through Entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-03-19 | House | File Number 66 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Calendar Number 59 |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |