CT HB07082 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To include African-American studies in the social studies component of the public school curriculum.
Title
An Act Concerning The Inclusion Of Black And Latino Studies In The Public School Curriculum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 272 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 180 AS AMENDED (Y: 122 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 180 AS AMENDED (Y: 122 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-06 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-06 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-05 | House | Public Act 19-12 |
2019-05-30 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-24 | House | File Number 992 |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Calendar Number 596 |
2019-05-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-22 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8951 |
2019-05-14 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-14 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-11 | House | File Number 614 |
2019-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 368 |
2019-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |