CT HB07083 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - File Number 1014
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To include Puerto Rican and Latino studies in the social studies component of the public school curriculum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Inclusion Of Climate Change Instruction In The Science Component Of The Public School Curriculum.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 214 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 102 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 215 AS AMENDED (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30HouseFile Number 1014
2019-05-30HouseSenate Calendar Number 632
2019-05-30HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-28HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-28HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9557
2019-05-14HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-14HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-14HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-11HouseFile Number 615
2019-04-11HouseHouse Calendar Number 369
2019-04-11HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-11HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-05HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-27HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/06
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback