CT HB07090 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Commissioner of Social Services to provide equitable weekly reimbursement rates under the Medicaid program for all methadone maintenance programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning An Equitable Minimum Methadone Maintenance Reimbursement Rate Under The Medicaid Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-14HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-14HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-19HouseFile Number 68
2019-03-19HouseHouse Calendar Number 61
2019-03-19HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-19HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-05HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-05HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-14HousePublic Hearing 02/19
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Human Services

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback