CT HB07094 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - File Number 965
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - File Number 965
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure the health and well-being of young children receiving temporary family assistance by providing their families with an additional thirty dollars in benefits monthly per child under the age of three to purchase diapers.
Title
An Act Concerning Diaper Assistance For Needy Families.
Sponsors
House Human Services Committee | Rep. Bobby Gibson [D] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] | Rep. Olivia Floren [R] |
Sen. Patricia Miller [D] | Rep. Caroline Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 153 AS AMENDED (Y: 121 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | File Number 965 |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 573 |
2019-05-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8643 |
2019-05-14 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-14 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-19 | House | File Number 70 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Calendar Number 63 |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |