CT HB07095 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - File Number 778
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To allow a grandparent the right of visitation with his or her grandchild upon demonstrating to the court that clear and convincing circumstances support the granting of such visitation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning A Grandparent's Right To Visitation With His Or Her Grandchild.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseFile Number 778
2019-04-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 486
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-10HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-14HousePublic Hearing 03/18
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback