CT HB07097 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Senate Calendar Number 648
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Senate Calendar Number 648
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of the State to enhance the CONCORD commercial records database by allowing a member of the public to ascertain the name and address of a business entity's agent for service of process by entering the name of the owner, officer or agent of such business entity in the database.
Title
An Act Concerning Improved Public Access To Certain Business Records Filed With The Secretary Of The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 249 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 648 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2019-05-30 | House | House Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 414 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 266 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |