CT HB07099 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the minimum number of hours nurses and nurse's aides spend on patient care at nursing homes.
Title
An Act Increasing The Minimum Ratio Of Direct Care Staff In Nursing Homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health |
2019-03-07 | House | File Number 30 |
2019-03-07 | House | House Calendar Number 37 |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-26 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-13 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |