CT HB07102 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Senate Calendar Number 684
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To authorize multipurpose senior centers and a working group to help coordinate senior center planning, development and services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Senior Centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 327 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateSenate Calendar Number 684
2019-06-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-06-04SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-04HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10914
2019-05-16HouseFile Number 888
2019-05-16HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-16HouseNew File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-16HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-10HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/19 5:00 PM
2019-05-03HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-02HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-04-02HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-07HouseFile Number 33
2019-03-07HouseHouse Calendar Number 40
2019-03-07HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-07HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM
2019-02-27HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-26HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-13HousePublic Hearing 02/19
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Aging

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback