CT HB07104 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To modernize Connecticut trust law in order to allow the state to remain economically competitive, create jobs and retain businesses in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Adoption Of The Connecticut Uniform Trust Code.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Rosa Rebimbas [R] | Rep. Steven Stafstrom [D] | Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] |
Rep. Joseph Serra [D] | Sen. Gennaro Bizzarro [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 408 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 165 (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 165 (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-24 | House | Public Act 19-137 |
2019-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 583 |
2019-05-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | House Passed |
2019-04-29 | House | File Number 820 |
2019-04-29 | House | House Calendar Number 522 |
2019-04-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |