CT HB07113 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Education to study education issues.
Title
An Act Concerning Education Issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 366 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 181 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 95 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 192 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 181 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 95 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 192 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-24 | House | Public Act 19-139 |
2019-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2019-05-24 | House | File Number 993 |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Calendar Number 598 |
2019-05-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2019-05-22 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 9470 |
2019-05-22 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9342 |
2019-04-10 | House | File Number 576 |
2019-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 349 |
2019-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |