CT HB07125 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) require each health carrier to submit an annual report concerning parity for mental health and substance use disorder benefits, (2) require the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to insurance to conduct an annual public hearing concerning such report, (3) require nonquantitative treatment limitations to be applied equally to mental health and substance use disorder benefits and medical and surgical benefits under certain health insurance policies, (4) require health insurance coverage for (A) prescription drugs prescribed for the treatment of substance use disorders if a policy includes coverage for prescription drugs, and (B) substance abuse services regardless of whether such services were provided pursuant to a court order, and (5) prohibit mandatory step therapy and prior authorization for prescription drugs prescribed for the treatment of substance use disorders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Mental Health And Substance Use Disorder Benefits.

Sponsors

House Insurance and Real Estate Committee CommitteeRep. Cristin McCarthy Vahey [D]Sen. Catherine Osten [D]Rep. Brenda Kupchick [R]
Rep. Tom Arnone [D]Rep. John Hampton [D]Sen. Saud Anwar [D]Rep. David Michel [D]
Rep. Devin Carney [R]Rep. Lucy Dathan [D]Sen. Tony Hwang [R]Rep. Terrie Wood [R]
Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D]Rep. Fred Camillo [R]Rep. Robin Comey [D]Rep. Raghib Allie-Brennan [D]
Rep. Olivia Floren [R]Rep. Philip Young [D]Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R]Rep. Tami Zawistowski [R]
Rep. Peter Tercyak [D]Rep. Robin Green [R]Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D]Rep. Matthew Ritter [D]
Rep. Tom Delnicki [R]Rep. Christine Conley [D]Rep. Dave Yaccarino [R]Rep. David Rutigliano [R]
Rep. J.P. Sredzinski [R]Rep. Nicole Klarides-Ditria [R]Rep. Bill Simanski [R]Rep. Charles Ferraro [R]
Rep. Christine Pavalock-D'Amato [R]Rep. Laura Devlin [R]Rep. Holly Cheeseman [R]Rep. William Petit [R]
Rep. Jonathan Steinberg [D]Rep. Leslee Hill [R]Rep. William Buckbee [R]Rep. Kara Rochelle [D]
Rep. Ronald Napoli [D]Rep. Whit Betts [R]Rep. Hilda Santiago [D]Rep. Christie Carpino [R]
Rep. Gary Turco [D]Rep. Noreen Kokoruda [R]Rep. Pat Wilson Pheanious [D]Rep. Jesse MacLachlan [R]
Rep. Juan Candelaria [D]Sen. George Logan [R]Rep. Patricia Miller [D]Sen. Alexandra Bergstein [D]
Sen. Christine Cohen [D]Rep. Jason Rojas [D]Sen. Norman Needleman [D]Sen. Matthew Lesser [D]
Rep. Maria Horn [D]Sen. Kevin Kelly [R]Sen. Mary Daugherty Abrams [D]Sen. Julie Kushner [D]
Rep. Joseph Serra [D]Sen. Mae Flexer [D]Sen. Gennaro Bizzarro [R]Sen. Carlo Leone [D]
Rep. Kathleen McCarty [R]

Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 405 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 152 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-25HousePublic Act 19-159
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-22HouseFile Number 966
2019-05-22HouseSenate Calendar Number 575
2019-05-22HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-20HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-20HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8773
2019-05-14HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-14HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-14HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-03HouseFile Number 343
2019-04-03HouseHouse Calendar Number 221
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-03HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-20HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/05
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback