CT HB07126 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To permit an injured party to recover double or treble damages in civil actions involving a person who operates a motor vehicle while using a hand-held mobile device or other mobile electronic device in violation of section 14-296aa of the general statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Award Of Double Or Treble Damages To An Injured Party In A Civil Action Resulting From Certain Traffic Violations.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Sen. Robert Sampson [R] | Rep. Devin Carney [R] | Sen. Tony Hwang [R] |
Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] | Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] | Sen. Gennaro Bizzarro [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 348 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 63 (Y: 135 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 63 (Y: 135 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-25 | House | Public Act 19-160 |
2019-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed |
2019-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 417 |
2019-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | House Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 417 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 269 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |