CT HB07132 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - File Number 1024
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the licensure of professional counselor associates and marital and family therapist associates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Licensure Of Professional Counselor Associates And Marital And Family Therapist Associates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 233 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseFile Number 1024
2019-05-31HouseSenate Calendar Number 656
2019-05-31HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-29HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-29HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8237
2019-04-09HouseFile Number 557
2019-04-09HouseHouse Calendar Number 339
2019-04-09HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-09HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-25HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-20HousePublic Hearing 02/25
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback