CT HB07134 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow a passenger who is a veteran, upon presentation of a motor vehicle operator's license or identity card indicating such passenger's status as a veteran, to ride state-owned or state-controlled bus public transportation free of charge.
Title
An Act Concerning Reduced Bus Fares For Veterans.
Sponsors
House Veterans' Affairs Committee | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Raghib Allie-Brennan [D] | Rep. Caroline Simmons [D] |
Rep. John Hampton [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation |
2019-03-28 | House | File Number 191 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 141 |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |