CT HB07135 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on General Law
Pending: Joint General Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on General Law
Pending: Joint General Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the validity of an initial medical certification for qualifying medical marijuana patients and to provide such patients an opportunity to provide identifying information that he or she is a veteran.
Title
An Act Extending The Validity Of Written Certifications For Medical Marijuana And Identifying Veterans Who Have Prescriptions Therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on General Law |
2019-03-26 | House | File Number 145 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 119 |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |