CT HB07136 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To exempt veterans from payment of the motor vehicle registration fee associated with the Passport to the Parks program.
Title
An Act Exempting Veterans From The Passport To The Parks Motor Vehicle Registration Program Fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-03-26 | House | File Number 146 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 110 |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |