CT HB07141 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To define and regulate the use of electric foot scooters.
Title
An Act Regulating Electric Foot Scooters.
Sponsors
House Transportation Committee | Rep. Roland Lemar [D] | Rep. Bobby Gibson [D] | Rep. Gregory Haddad [D] |
Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 378 PASS (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 36 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 36 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-25 | House | Public Act 19-162 |
2019-06-05 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-04-25 | House | File Number 811 |
2019-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 410 |
2019-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-04-23 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7251 |
2019-04-08 | House | File Number 462 |
2019-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 306 |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |