CT HB07145 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 419
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To allow federal, state and local law enforcement officers to obtain insurance records from insurance companies to aid in the investigation of fires or explosions of an undetermined or incendiary origin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Allowing Police Officers To Obtain Information To Be Furnished Relative To Fire Or Explosion Losses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 419
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 271
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/07
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback