CT HB07146 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 420
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To include, within the offense of intimidation based on bigotry or bias, the act of a person intimidating or harassing another person because such other person is a police officer, a firefighter, an advanced emergency medical technician, an emergency medical responder, an emergency medical technician, a paramedic or a correction officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Intimidation On Account Of Occupation As A Public Safety Employee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 420
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 272
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/07
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback