CT HB07150 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - File Number 892
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - File Number 892
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Implementing The Governor's Budget Recommendations Concerning Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | File Number 892 |
2019-05-16 | House | House Calendar Number 598 |
2019-05-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/19 5:00 PM |
2019-05-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-02 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |