CT HB07151 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 421
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - File Number 421
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Energy Efficiency Standards.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D] | Rep. Matthew Ritter [D] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Sen. Robert Duff [D] |
Rep. Anne Hughes [D] | Rep. Kim Rose [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Stephanie Cummings [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 421 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 273 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |