CT HB07157 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide funding for bikeway paths, recreational trails and greenways.
Title
An Act Concerning Funding For Bikeway Paths, Recreational Trails And Greenways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-03-28 | House | File Number 193 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 143 |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |