CT HB07158 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To exempt certain persons who care for dogs and cats in their home from regulations that apply to commercial kennels.
Title
An Act Exempting Certain Persons Engaged In The Boarding Of Cats And Dogs From The Requirement To Obtain A License To Operate A Commercial Kennel.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Brenda Kupchick [R] | Rep. Bobby Gibson [D] | Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 361 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 150 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 150 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-24 | House | Public Act 19-156 |
2019-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-20 | House | File Number 937 |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Calendar Number 529 |
2019-05-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-16 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8960 |
2019-03-28 | House | File Number 194 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 144 |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |