CT HB07159 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Addressing Opioid Use.

Sponsors

Rep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D]Rep. Matthew Ritter [D]Sen. Martin Looney [D]Sen. Robert Duff [D]
Rep. David Rutigliano [R]Rep. John Hampton [D]Rep. Patricia Dillon [D]Sen. Kevin Witkos [R]
Rep. Vincent Candelora [R]Rep. Tom O'Dea [R]Rep. Terrie Wood [R]Rep. Philip Young [D]
Rep. Nicole Klarides-Ditria [R]Rep. Craig Fishbein [R]Rep. Dave Yaccarino [R]Rep. John Frey [R]
Rep. Kim Rose [D]Rep. J.P. Sredzinski [R]Rep. Maria Horn [D]Rep. Richard Smith [R]
Rep. William Buckbee [R]Rep. Leslee Hill [R]Rep. Arthur O'Neill [R]Rep. Tami Zawistowski [R]
Rep. Holly Cheeseman [R]Rep. Mitch Bolinsky [R]Rep. Joseph Zullo [R]Rep. Bill Simanski [R]
Rep. William Petit [R]Rep. Timothy Ackert [R]Rep. Anthony D'Amelio [R]Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D]
Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D]Rep. Charles Ferraro [R]Rep. Devin Carney [R]Rep. Patricia Miller [D]
Rep. Irene Haines [R]Rep. David Wilson [R]Rep. Brian Lanoue [R]Rep. Kathy Kennedy [R]
Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D]Rep. David Labriola [R]Rep. Stephen Harding [R]Rep. Sean Scanlon [D]
Rep. Olivia Floren [R]Rep. Robin Green [R]Rep. Fred Camillo [R]Rep. Jane Garibay [D]
Rep. Joseph Verrengia [D]Rep. Lezlye Zupkus [R]Rep. Rosa Rebimbas [R]Rep. Whit Betts [R]
Rep. Ronald Napoli [D]Rep. Gary Turco [D]Rep. Hilda Santiago [D]Rep. Jesse MacLachlan [R]
Rep. Henry Genga [D]Sen. Henri Martin [R]Sen. Tony Hwang [R]Sen. Gennaro Bizzarro [R]
Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R]Sen. George Logan [R]Rep. Tammy Exum [D]Rep. Pat Wilson Pheanious [D]
Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D]Rep. Kathleen McCarty [R]Rep. Caroline Simmons [D]Sen. Dan Champagne [R]
Sen. Saud Anwar [D]Rep. Antonio Felipe [D]Rep. Tom Delnicki [R]Sen. Norman Needleman [D]
Sen. Catherine Osten [D]Sen. Kevin Kelly [R]Sen. Alexandra Bergstein [D]Rep. Brandon McGee [D]
Sen. James Maroney [D]Sen. Julie Kushner [D]Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D]Rep. Robin Comey [D]
Sen. Mae Flexer [D]Sen. Carlo Leone [D]Sen. Derek Slap [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 350 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 306 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-26SenatePublic Act 19-191
2019-06-05SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04SenateSenate Calendar Number 681
2019-06-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-06-04SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-04HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10686
2019-04-24HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-24HouseNo New File by Committee on Public Health
2019-04-24HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-24HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-24HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-17HouseReferred by House to Committee on Public Health
2019-04-08HouseFile Number 481
2019-04-08HouseHouse Calendar Number 307
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-08HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-22HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-21HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-07HousePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on General Law

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback