CT HB07160 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - File Number 1015
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Increasing Voter Access.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 221 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 84 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 222 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 59 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 223 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 59 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 224 AS AMENDED (Y: 85 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30HouseFile Number 1015
2019-05-30HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-28HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-28HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 9001
2019-05-28HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 9765
2019-05-28HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9885
2019-05-15HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-15HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-15HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-13HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-18HouseFile Number 754
2019-04-18HouseHouse Calendar Number 452
2019-04-18HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-18HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-02HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-21HousePublic Hearing 03/25
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback