CT HB07163 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department On Aging And Disability Services And Meals On Wheels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 362 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 156 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 156 AS AMENDED (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-24 | House | Public Act 19-157 |
2019-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-22 | House | File Number 967 |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 581 |
2019-05-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9061 |
2019-04-02 | House | File Number 264 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 191 |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |