CT HB07165 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To provide Medicaid reimbursement for donor breast milk deemed medically necessary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Medicaid Coverage For Donor Breast Milk.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 332 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 188 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-17HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-17HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-13HousePublic Act 19-48
2019-06-04HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-04HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-24HouseFile Number 994
2019-05-24HouseSenate Calendar Number 602
2019-05-24HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-22HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-22HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8769
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 423
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 275
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-22HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-21HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/28
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Human Services

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback