CT HB07168 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To ensure that persons with autism spectrum disorder receive services from the Department of Developmental Services and are eligible for Medicaid coverage despite family earnings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Transitional Services For Children With Autism Spectrum Disorder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 324 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 47 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-19HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-19HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-13HousePublic Act 19-49
2019-06-04HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-04HouseSenate Passed
2019-04-25HouseSenate Calendar Number 412
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-24HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-16HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-16HouseNo New File by Committee on Education
2019-04-16HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-16HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-15HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Education
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 424
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 276
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-19HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/28
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Human Services

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback