CT HB07173 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-11-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - File Number 1004
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To provide that no insurer, health care center, fraternal benefit society, hospital service corporation, medical service corporation or other entity delivering, issuing for delivery, renewing, amending or continuing an individual or group vision plan in this state shall include in any contract with an optometrist any provision that requires the optometrist to accept as payment an amount set by such insurer, center, society, corporation or entity for products provided to an insured or enrollee that are not covered benefits under such insured's or enrollee's plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Contracts Between Health Insurers, Optometrists And Ophthalmologists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 205 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28HouseFile Number 1004
2019-05-28HouseSenate Calendar Number 620
2019-05-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-23HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-23HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9213
2019-04-02HouseFile Number 286
2019-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 193
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/28
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback