CT HB07174 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - File Number 287
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To: (1) Establish the "Connecticut Prescription Drug Program" and the "Connecticut prescription drug program account"; (2) require pharmaceutical manufacturers to send notice to the Insurance Commissioner regarding "pay-for-delay" agreements, and require health carriers and pharmacy benefits managers to reduce the cost of brand name prescription drugs that are the subject of such agreements; (3) require the Comptroller to offer qualified private employers the option to purchase prescription drugs for their employees, employees' dependents and retirees through the Comptroller's purchasing authority; (4) prohibit any health carrier or pharmacy benefits manager from recouping any portion of a claim that such carrier or manager has paid to a pharmacy or pharmacist; and (5) establish a task force to study drug reimportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Prescription Drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseFile Number 287
2019-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 194
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/28
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback