CT HB07182 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - File Number 866
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - File Number 866
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow the use of self-serve alcoholic liquid machines on certain permit premises.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Alcoholic Beverage Machines.
Sponsors
House General Law Committee | Sen. James Maroney [D] | Rep. Raghib Allie-Brennan [D] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] |
Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] | Sen. Alexandra Kasser [D] | Sen. Norman Needleman [D] | Rep. David Arconti [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 71 AS AMENDED (Y: 113 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | File Number 866 |
2019-05-09 | House | Senate Calendar Number 468 |
2019-05-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7292 |
2019-03-19 | House | File Number 74 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Calendar Number 67 |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |