CT HB07184 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To make changes to the Liquor Control Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Liquor Control Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-10HouseFile Number 577
2019-04-10HouseHouse Calendar Number 350
2019-04-10HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-10HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-26HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-26HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/28
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on General Law

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback