CT HB07191 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - File Number 195
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - File Number 195
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Increasing The Minimum Wage.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D] | Rep. Matthew Ritter [D] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Sen. Robert Duff [D] |
Rep. David Michel [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | File Number 195 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 145 |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |