CT HB07194 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To eliminate the requirement that a claimant not be entitled to compensation under chapter 568 of the general statutes when determining the repose period for a product liability claim in which the claimant alleges that harm occurred during the useful sale life of the product.
Title
An Act Concerning Exceptions To The Ten-year Repose Period For Certain Product Liability Claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 346 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 158 (Y: 119 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 158 (Y: 119 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-19 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-19 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-15 | House | Public Act 17-97 |
2017-06-06 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-06 | House | Senate Passed |
2017-05-19 | House | Senate Calendar Number 482 |
2017-05-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-17 | House | House Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | File Number 264 |
2017-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 204 |
2017-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |