CT HB07194 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To implement the Department of Public Health's recommendations regarding public drinking water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Recommendations Regarding Public Drinking Water And Clarification Concerning The Effect Of The Provisions Of The State Water Plan And Defining Municipality With Respect To Stormwater Authorities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 428 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 294 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 295 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-26SenatePublic Act 19-194
2019-06-05SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-06-05SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-06-04SenateSenate Calendar Number 677
2019-06-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-06-04SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-04HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
2019-06-04HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 10832
2019-06-04HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10598
2019-04-09HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-09HouseNo New File by Committee on Energy and Technology
2019-04-09HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-09HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-09HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-02HouseReferred by House to Committee on Energy and Technology
2019-03-26HouseFile Number 149
2019-03-26HouseHouse Calendar Number 113
2019-03-26HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-26HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-08HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-28HousePublic Hearing 03/04
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback