CT HB07200 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-02 - Senate Calendar Number 571
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-02 - Senate Calendar Number 571
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the task force on life-threatening food allergies in schools.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Task Force On Life-threatening Food Allergies In Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 309 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 571 |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2017-06-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8134 |
2017-04-11 | House | File Number 508 |
2017-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 348 |
2017-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |