CT HB07200 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-24-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Senate Calendar Number 530
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit the sale of cigarettes, tobacco products, electronic nicotine delivery systems and vapor products to persons under age twenty-one.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Prohibiting The Sale Of Cigarettes, Tobacco Products, Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems And Vapor Products To Persons Under Age Twenty-one.

Sponsors

House Public Health Committee CommitteeRep. Cristin McCarthy Vahey [D]Rep. Steven Stafstrom [D]Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D]
Sen. Saud Anwar [D]Rep. Christopher Rosario [D]Sen. Tony Hwang [R]Sen. Leonard Fasano [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Currey [D]Rep. Gail Lavielle [R]Rep. Liz Linehan [D]Sen. Mae Flexer [D]
Sen. Marilyn Moore [D]Rep. Tom Arnone [D]Rep. Christopher Perone [D]Sen. Eric Berthel [R]
Rep. Gary Turco [D]Rep. John Hampton [D]Rep. Bob Godfrey [D]Rep. Michael Winkler [D]
Rep. Brenda Kupchick [R]Rep. Dorinda Keenan Borer [D]Rep. Henry Genga [D]Rep. Quentin Phipps [D]
Sen. Martin Looney [D]Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R]Rep. Caroline Simmons [D]Sen. Derek Slap [D]
Rep. Kevin Ryan [D]Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D]Rep. Anne Hughes [D]Rep. David Arconti [D]
Rep. Peter Tercyak [D]Rep. Sean Scanlon [D]Rep. Travis Simms [D]Rep. Jonathan Steinberg [D]
Rep. Jason Doucette [D]Rep. Tom O'Dea [R]Rep. Lucy Dathan [D]Rep. Christine Conley [D]
Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D]Rep. Kim Rose [D]Rep. Jill Barry [D]Sen. Christine Cohen [D]
Sen. Mary Daugherty Abrams [D]Rep. Joshua Elliott [D]Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D]Rep. Noreen Kokoruda [R]
Rep. Edwin Vargas [D]Rep. Nicole Klarides-Ditria [R]Rep. Gregory Haddad [D]Rep. John Frey [R]
Sen. Julie Kushner [D]Sen. Gary Winfield [D]Sen. Stephen Cassano [D]Sen. Henri Martin [R]
Sen. James Maroney [D]Rep. Bill Simanski [R]Sen. Robert Duff [D]Rep. Terrie Wood [R]
Rep. Kate Rotella [D]Rep. Joseph Gresko [D]Rep. Dave Yaccarino [R]Rep. David Michel [D]
Rep. Jillian Gilchrest [D]Sen. George Logan [R]Sen. Matthew Lesser [D]Rep. Linda Orange [D]
Rep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D]Rep. Matthew Ritter [D]Rep. Michelle Cook [D]Rep. Joseph Verrengia [D]
Rep. Russell Morin [D]Rep. Julio Concepcion [D]Rep. Kerry Szeps Wood [D]Sen. Alexandra Bergstein [D]
Rep. Timothy Ackert [R]Rep. Laura Devlin [R]Rep. Leslee Hill [R]Rep. Bobby Gibson [D]
Rep. Holly Cheeseman [R]Rep. Kathleen McCarty [R]Rep. Charlie Stallworth [D]Rep. Olivia Floren [R]
Rep. Kathy Kennedy [R]Rep. Charles Ferraro [R]Rep. William Petit [R]

Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 132 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 121 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 133 AS AMENDED (Y: 124 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseSenate Calendar Number 530
2019-05-20HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-16HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-16HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8835
2019-05-02HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-02HouseNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-05-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-02HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-01HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-17HouseReferred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-04-10HouseFile Number 579
2019-04-10HouseHouse Calendar Number 352
2019-04-10HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-10HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-25HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-28HousePublic Hearing 03/04
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback