CT HB07201 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning The Convenience Of Acquiring Motor Vehicle Licenses And Registrations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 332 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 377 PASS (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 377 PASS (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Public Act 19-165 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 688 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2019-06-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10312 |
2019-05-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2019-04-08 | House | File Number 483 |
2019-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 310 |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |