CT HB07203 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Senate Calendar Number 483
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To promote the safety of pedestrians by requiring motorists to grant the right-of-way to pedestrians who affirmatively indicate their intention to cross the road in a crosswalk.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Pedestrian Safety At Crosswalks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 86 (Y: 110 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseSenate Calendar Number 483
2019-05-10HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-08HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 426
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 278
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 02/27
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback