CT HB07213 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 693
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 693
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To eliminate registrar-appointed challengers from who may be present in the polling place during a primary or election.
Title
An Act Concerning Electoral Privileges Of Certain Parolees And Challengers In The Polling Place.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] | Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D] |
Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | File Number 693 |
2019-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 429 |
2019-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |