CT HB07218 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-13-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require the safe storage of all firearms, whether loaded or unloaded, in a home with a minor under eighteen years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Safe Storage Of Firearms In The Home And Firearm Safety Programs In Public Schools.

Sponsors

House Judiciary Committee CommitteeRep. Sean Scanlon [D]Rep. Steven Stafstrom [D]Rep. Robin Comey [D]
Rep. Cristin McCarthy Vahey [D]Rep. Julio Concepcion [D]Rep. Bob Godfrey [D]Rep. John Hampton [D]
Sen. Will Haskell [D]Sen. Mary Daugherty Abrams [D]Rep. Lucy Dathan [D]Rep. Joshua Elliott [D]
Rep. Jill Barry [D]Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D]Rep. Jonathan Steinberg [D]Rep. Patricia Miller [D]
Sen. Christine Cohen [D]Rep. Christopher Rosario [D]Rep. David Michel [D]Rep. Patricia Dillon [D]
Rep. Emmett Riley [D]Rep. Jason Doucette [D]Rep. John Hennessy [D]Rep. Noreen Kokoruda [R]
Rep. Gail Lavielle [R]Sen. Derek Slap [D]Rep. John Frey [R]Rep. Vincent Candelora [R]
Sen. Stephen Cassano [D]Sen. Julie Kushner [D]Rep. Juan Candelaria [D]Rep. Brenda Kupchick [R]
Rep. Stephen Meskers [D]Rep. Michael D'Agostino [D]Sen. Alexandra Bergstein [D]Sen. Tony Hwang [R]
Rep. Joseph Gresko [D]Rep. Michael Winkler [D]Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D]Rep. Fred Camillo [R]
Rep. Caroline Simmons [D]Rep. Olivia Floren [R]Rep. Jillian Gilchrest [D]Rep. Joseph Verrengia [D]
Rep. Christopher Perone [D]Rep. Anne Hughes [D]Rep. Jeffrey Currey [D]Rep. Robert Sanchez [D]
Rep. Edwin Vargas [D]Rep. Gregory Haddad [D]Rep. Maria Horn [D]Rep. Matthew Ritter [D]
Rep. Philip Young [D]Rep. Terrie Wood [R]Rep. Bobby Gibson [D]Rep. Holly Cheeseman [R]
Rep. Tammy Exum [D]Rep. Robin Green [R]Rep. Laura Devlin [R]Rep. Charlie Stallworth [D]
Rep. Russell Morin [D]Rep. Pat Wilson Pheanious [D]Rep. Larry Butler [D]Rep. Rosa Rebimbas [R]
Rep. Gary Turco [D]Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D]Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D]Rep. Hilda Santiago [D]
Rep. Michelle Cook [D]Sen. Carlo Leone [D]Sen. Marilyn Moore [D]Sen. Robert Duff [D]
Sen. Douglas McCrory [D]Rep. Dorinda Keenan Borer [D]Rep. Raghib Allie-Brennan [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 200 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8754 (Y: 2 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 201 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 8738 (Y: 11 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 202 PASS (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 74 (Y: 127 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-05-29HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-05-29HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-05-28HousePublic Act 19-5
2019-05-23HouseIn Concurrence
2019-05-23HouseSenate Passed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8738
2019-05-23HouseSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8754
2019-05-09HouseSenate Calendar Number 472
2019-05-09HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-07HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 429
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 281
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-04HousePublic Hearing 03/11
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback